# Multiply 11 x 7 x 23

by Kaylee
(Texas)

Multiply three numbers

What is the answer to this math question?

• Multiply the following chain of three numbers:

11 x 7 x 23 = ?

How do I show my work?

### Comments for Multiply 11 x 7 x 23

 Sep 29, 2012 Multiplication by: Staff Answer: Part I The first thing to remember when multiplying a series of numbers is: Multiply two numbers at a time.:       This property is called Associative Property of Multiplication :       Any series of factors (your factors are 11, 7, and 23) can be grouped in any way and multiplied in any order without changing the results. This does apply to all real numbers (including: fractions, decimals, and negative numbers).       For example:            (11 * 7) * 23 = 1771 Multiplying the two numbers 11 * 7 = 77, and then multiplying the two number 77 * 23 = 1771            is just a valid as            11 * (7 * 23) = 1771 multiplying the two numbers 7 * 23 = 161, and then multiplying the two numbers 11 * 161 = 1771 -----------------------------------------------

 Sep 29, 2012 Multiplication by: Staff ----------------------------------------------- Part II The second thing to remember is that numbers can be multiplied in any order without changing the final result.       This property is called Commutative Property of Multiplication:       Any two factors can be multiplied in either order without changing the results. This applies to all real numbers (including: fractions, decimals, and negative numbers).       For example:            multiplying 11 * 7 = 77       is just a valid as            multiplying 7 * 11 = 77 Your Question: 11 x 7 x 23 = ?       The three numbers in your question are: 11, 7, and 23       These numbers grouped in any order, and multiplied in any order. The result will always be the same.            (11 * 7) * 23 = 1771            11 * (7 * 23) = 1771            (11 * 23) * 7 = 1771            11 * (23 * 7) = 1771            (7 * 11) * 23 = 1771            7 * (11 * 23) = 1771            (7 * 23) * 11 = 1771            7 * (23 * 11) = 1771            (23 * 11) * 7 = 1771            23 * (11 * 7) = 1771            (23 * 7) * 11 = 1771            23 * (7 * 11) = 1771 Thanks for writing. Staff www.solving-math-problems.com