logo for solving-math-problems.com
leftimage for solving-math-problems.com

Quiz on Cambridge Test










































using the following digits 2,4,6,8, solve this equasion





what numbers would you use to


# # X # # > 5000

what mutiples are used

Comments for Quiz on Cambridge Test

Click here to add your own comments

Apr 19, 2012
Quiz on Cambridge Test
by: Staff


Question:

using the following digits 2,4,6,8, solve this equation

what numbers would you use to


# # X # # > 5000

what multiples are used



Answer:


How many 4-digit numbers can be formed by the digits 2 4 6 8 (each digit can be used only once)?

There is a formula which you can use to calculate these permutations of the four digits:

P(n,r) = n! / (n - r)!

0 ≤ r ≤ n
n = number of elements in the set { 2,4,6,8 } = 4
r = number of elements selected = 1, 2, 3, or 4 [r = 4 will be used]

Order is important

Repetition is not allowed



List has 24 possibilities:

{2,4,6,8} {2,4,8,6} {2,6,4,8} {2,6,8,4} {2,8,4,6} {2,8,6,4} {4,2,6,8} {4,2,8,6} {4,6,2,8} {4,6,8,2} {4,8,2,6} {4,8,6,2} {6,2,4,8} {6,2,8,4} {6,4,2,8} {6,4,8,2} {6,8,2,4} {6,8,4,2} {8,2,4,6} {8,2,6,4} {8,4,2,6} {8,4,6,2} {8,6,2,4} {8,6,4,2}

24*68 = 1632
24*86 = 2064
26*48 = 1248
26*84 = 2184
28*46 = 1288
28*64 = 1792
42*68 = 2586
42*86 = 3612
46*28 = 1288
46*82 = 3772
48*26 = 1248
48*62 = 2976
62*48 = 2976
62*84 = 5208
64*28 = 1792
64*82 = 5248
68*24 = 1632
68*42 = 2856
82*46 = 3772
82*64 = 5248
84*26 = 2184
84*62 = 5208
86*24 = 2064
86*42 = 3612


>>> the final answer is:

62 x 84 > 5000

or

84 x 62 > 5000

or

64 x 82 > 5000

or

82 x 64 > 5000




Thanks for writing.

Staff
www.solving-math-problems.com



Click here to add your own comments

Join in and write your own page! It's easy to do. How? Simply click here to return to Math Questions & Comments - 01.



Copyright © 2008-2015. All rights reserved. Solving-Math-Problems.com